Cossons, Nandini Heather (CPSO#: 76148)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Haliburton Family Medical Centre 7217 Gelert Road Haliburton, ON K0M 1S0
Instructions: Med-Team Clinic 99 Kakulu Road Kanata, ON K2L 3C8
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2003 to 25 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2003 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2015