Costa, Stacy Lara (CPSO#: 73821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
1780 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone: (416) 291-2205
Fax: (416) 291-0149
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Costa ( CPSO# 73821 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 291-2205

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACY LARA COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2005