Costa Vitali, Atilio Eugenio (CPSO#: 89192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:National University of Tucuman, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 3661
Fax: (705) 523-7081
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardiovascular CRO - Ltd
885 Regent St
Unit 3 - 28B
Sudbury ON  P3E 5M1
Canada
Phone: (705) 419-2082
Fax: 705-222-2586
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Sudbury Outpatient Center (S.O.C)
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 7255
Fax: 705-523-7256
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Sudbury Outpatient Center (S.O.C)
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 7255
Fax: 705-523-7265
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Atilio Costa-Vitali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Costa Vitali ( CPSO# 89192 )

Business Address:
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 675-4883

Business Address:
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 988-3048

Business Address:
Room 3-28B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5M1
Phone Number: (705) 988-3048

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Cardiology
Centre Tower 3rd Floor
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 03 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Atilio Eugenio Costa Vitali may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Cardiology, Division of  Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School
                        of Medicine in which Dr. Costa Vitali holds an academic appointment
                        at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires when Dr. Costa
                  Vitali no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.