Costescu, Dustin James Whitby (CPSO#: 86495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
H S C Room 2F 45
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

M-410
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-8606
Fax: (905) 381-7035
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Costescu ( CPSO# 86495 )

Business Address:
711 Concesssion Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
McMaster University
HSC Room 2F 45
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 11 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSTIN JAMES WHITBY COSTESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 12 Sep 2011 to 11 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 12 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012