Costin, Ioana Ruxandra (CPSO#: 76323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers FHT
Unit B12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costin Yakoub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yakoub ( CPSO# 78891 )
Dr. I. Costin ( CPSO# 76323 )

Business Address:
2 Rivers Family Health Team Clinic
B12-350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Business Address:
Grand River Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IOANA RUXANDRA COSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2005