Cowan, Juthaporn (CPSO#: 91210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:Mahidol University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Infectious Diseases
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79617
Fax: (613) 737-8352
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juthaporn Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cowan ( CPSO# 91210 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Divison of Infectious Diseases
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUTHAPORN COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013