Cowan, Simone Suzanne Monica (CPSO#: 79403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul's Hospital
474A - 1081 Burrard St.
Vancouver, B.C.
V6Z 1Y6
Vancouver BC  V6Z 1Y6
Phone: (604) 806-9282
Fax: (604) 806-9927
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Infinity Medical Specialists Clinic
Unit 201-2460 Commercial Dr
Vancouver BC
V5N 1W2
Vancouver BC  V5N 4B9
Canada
Phone: (778) 378 4672
Fax: (778) 379 4670
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE SUZANNE MONICA COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012