Crabbe, Rory Adam (CPSO#: 98049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 4N7
Phone: (519) 432-6786
Fax: (519) 432-3292
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rory Crabbe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Crabbe ( CPSO# 98049 )

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 4N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-6786

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RORY ADAM CRABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014