Craddock, Kenneth James (CPSO#: 81337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket
Toronto ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2983
Fax: (905) 952-2824
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JAMES CRADDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRADDOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009