Craig, Jeffrey David Clark (CPSO#: 92764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: 905-579-1212 Ext. 515
Fax: 289-731-2034
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Craig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 92764 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID CLARK CRAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014