Crawford, Alyson (CPSO#: 91249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYSON CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2018