Crawford, Kelsey Anne (CPSO#: 95805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
Rm 1105 - 505 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 25 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELSEY ANNE CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018