Crean, Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 81479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Southampton, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
Rm 4414B
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7267 Ext. 67267
Fax: (613) 696-7248
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Ncsb 1C 554
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: (416) 340-5014
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

22 Foxbar Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2G6
Canada
Phone: 4163404800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crean ( CPSO# 81479 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Hospital
NCSB 1C 554
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Room 4414B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Andrew Michael Crean may practise medicine independently in Cardiology and
            Diagnostic Radiology.