Cripps, John Robert (CPSO#: 53166)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.R. Cripps Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cripps ( CPSO# 53166 )

Business Address:
Health Canada
Therapeutic Products Directorate
101 Tunney's Pasture Driveway
Suite AL 0202B1
Ottawa ON  K1A 1B9
Phone Number: (613) 941-3207

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical records can contact: RSRS 1-888-563-3732, Fax: 416-398-5932 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto, ON M3J 1X6
Date Received: 09 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2019