Crispino, Natascha Heidemarie (CPSO#: 76416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway East Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natascha Crispino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Crispino ( CPSO# 76416 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
30 The Queensway East Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASCHA HEIDEMARIE CRISPINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISPINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003