Cristian, Alexandra Laura (CPSO#: 98143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C.A.M.H.
Adult Neurodevelopmental Services
Unit 4-4 Room 402
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 32817
Fax: 416-583-1241
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.L. Cristian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cristian ( CPSO# 98143 )

Business Address:
C.A.M.H.
Adult Neurodevelopmental Services
402 - 1001 Queen Street West
unit 4-4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA LAURA CRISTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017