Crombeen, Allison Marie (CPSO#: 95093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospice
475 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W3
Phone: (519) 337-3848
Fax: (519) 337-0540
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison M. Crombeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crombeen ( CPSO# 95093 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospice
475 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W3
Phone Number: (519) 337-3848

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON MARIE CROMBEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROMBEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013