Crombie, Kenneth Alexander Tighe (CPSO#: 89455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3594
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A.T. Crombie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Crombie ( CPSO# 89455 )

Business Address:
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ALEXANDER TIGHE CROMBIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROMBIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015