Cronin, Christopher Peter (CPSO#: 82488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1959 Bloor St West
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone: 416-639-6321
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Cronin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Cronin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PETER CRONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRONIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012