Crooks, Simone Lisa (CPSO#: 74970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 225
250 B Greenbank Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8X4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

190 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 6136866656
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Shenassa & S. Crooks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shenassa ( CPSO# 61304 )
Dr. S. Crooks ( CPSO# 74970 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 725-1870

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE LISA CROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROOKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005