Crookshank, Emily Dawn (CPSO#: 86334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E.D. Crookshank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crookshank ( CPSO# 86334 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Canadian Neurological Centre
130 Dundas Street East
Suite 404
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 232-6556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY DAWN CROOKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROOKSHANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2012