Crowe, Adrian Charles (CPSO#: 76112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines Site Hospital
1200 fourth avenue
St. Catharines, Ontario
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. C. Crowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crowe ( CPSO# 76112 )

Business Address:
St Catharines Site Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN CHARLES CROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003