Crowson, Jonathan Brian (CPSO#: 90317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Crowson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Crowson ( CPSO# 90317 )

Business Address:
St. Joesphs Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Mountain Health Services
Division of Geriatric Psychiatry
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Oct 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jonathan Brian Crowson may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry  and  Behavioural  Neurosciences,  Division of Geriatric
                        Psychiatry,  McMaster  University  in  which Dr. Crowson  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of  Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Crowson no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.