Crozier, Michael Scott (CPSO#: 94479)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 416 100 Arden Street Moncton, NB E1C 4B7
Date Received: 31 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 28 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 16 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014