Cruce, Roxana (CPSO#: 90103)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2009 to 29 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2009 to 29 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2010 to 12 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2015