Cruickshank, Beth Anne (CPSO#: 86286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2737 Keele Street
Unit 112
Toronto ON  M3M 2E9
Phone: (647) 347-8433
Fax: 647-660-1800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beth Cruickshank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cruickshank ( CPSO# 86286 )

Business Address:
Suite 112
2737 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3M 2E9
Phone Number: (647) 347-8433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH ANNE CRUICKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012