Cruz, Geraldine Z Velasco (CPSO#: 83207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Manila Central University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 848-2789
Fax: (905) 897-3399
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Cruz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cruz ( CPSO# 106099)
Dr. G. Cruz ( CPSO# 83207 )

Business Address:
310 - 3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 848-2789

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALDINE Z VELASCO CRUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007