Cruz, Norman Matias (CPSO#: 42822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 203 Huron St Stratford, ON N5A 5S9
Instructions: Please send a written request to the address above.
Date Received: 07 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018