Cruz Pereira, Oscar Octavio (CPSO#: 90116)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2009 to 25 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014