Cruz Quiroga, Juan Pablo (CPSO#: 92383)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2010 to 25 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013