Cubillos Salcedo, Javier Enrique (CPSO#: 93746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Sep 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 21 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAVIER ENRIQUE CUBILLOS SALCEDO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CUBILLOS SALCEDO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Sep 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2018 to 30 Sep 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018