Cucan, Elissa Lauren (CPSO#: 89206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
(mailing: PO Box 51031
375 Des Epinettes K1E 3E0)
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISSA LAUREN CUCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUCAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010