Cudmore, Stephen Bruce (CPSO#: 68008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-1500
Fax: (705) 522-1820
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Cudmore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cudmore ( CPSO# 68008 )

Business Address:
7 - 2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN BRUCE CUDMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUDMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996