Culbert, Alison Jane (CPSO#: 74860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
2075 Bayview Avenue Room A103
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4936
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powis and Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Culbert ( CPSO# 74860 )
Dr. J. Powis ( CPSO# 74878 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6252

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone Number: (416) 461-1925

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Womens HSC
A-103
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4936

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4180

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON JANE CULBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002