Cummings, Michael Bernard George (CPSO#: 71070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. A. Gray ( CPSO# 71331 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G4
Phone Number: (613) 549-7477

Business Address:
KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD GEORGE CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2003 to 13 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2003