Cummings, Theresa Kasumi Eva (CPSO#: 95993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theresa Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cummings ( CPSO# 95993 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
201-1635 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
510-330 Hwy #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
3-5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
308-2175 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 638-5889

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA KASUMI EVA CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017