Cunha, Marcelo Viana Rodrigues da (CPSO#: 92544)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Souza Marques Technical Educational Foun, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 25 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012