Cunic, Danny (CPSO#: 88925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  27 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sharbot Lake Family Health Team
1005 Medical Center Rd
Sharbot Lake ON  K0H 2P0
Phone: (613) 279-2100
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 27 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Danny  Cunic  may  practise  family  medicine at Sharbot Lake Family
                  Health   Team  in  Sharbot   Lake,  Ontario,  while   under   supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Cunic's  eligibility to take the College
                  of  Family  Physicians  of Canada examination  expires,  whichever  comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Cunic's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not  provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Cunic's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 28, 2017,  and  will expire on or
                  before September 27, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.