Cunje, Alwin (CPSO#: 80603)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Nov 2008 to 05 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010