Cupido, Tracy Lynn (CPSO#: 87169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Chronic Pain Clinic, JM 3
Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cupido ( CPSO# 87169 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology and Perioperative Me
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
Unit 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202

Business Address:
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
295 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Queens University
75 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNN CUPIDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPIDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Oct 2011 to 27 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013