Cupsa, Andreea (CPSO#: 76539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andreea Cupsa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cupsa ( CPSO# 76539 )

Business Address:
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREEA CUPSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2002 to 26 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004