Curran, Brian Michael (CPSO#: 63327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jackson Park Medical Centre
Suite 240
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 258-0441
Fax: (519) 258-0507
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre street West
Harrow ON  N0R 1G0
Canada
Phone: (519) 738-6692
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

116 Oak Styreet West
Leamington ON  N8H 2B6
Canada
Phone: 519-322-4488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

59 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 733-7644
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Curran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Curran ( CPSO# 63327 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
59 Main Street
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 733-7644

Business Address:
41 Centre Street West
Harrow ON  N0R 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 738-6692

Business Address:
Jackson Park Medical Centre
Suite 240
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 258-0441

Business Address:
166 Oak Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 2B6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1991