Curran, Helen Janet (CPSO#: 84422)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2006 to 28 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2009 to 10 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2015