Curran, James Andrew (CPSO#: 81544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 541-2310
Fax: (705) 942-5222
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Curran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Curran ( CPSO# 81544 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 256-7517

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ANDREW CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005