Cushing, Sharon Lynn Anne (CPSO#: 79404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept of Otolaryngology Head & Neck
6103C Burton Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6558
Fax: (416) 813-5036
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharon Cushing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cushing ( CPSO# 79404 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
Room 6103C Burton Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-2190

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LYNN ANNE CUSHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSHING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010