Custeau, Ingrid (CPSO#: 74290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3807
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ingrid Custeau Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Custeau ( CPSO# 74290 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID CUSTEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSTEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 1999 to 24 Oct 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000