Cuthbert, Anthony Lloyd (CPSO#: 50314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 204
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-6028
Fax: (416) 746-7505
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY LLOYD CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)