Cutz, Jean-Claude (CPSO#: 72006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Dept of Anatomic Pathology
Luke Wing L222
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6012
Fax: (905) 521-6192
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE CUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 06 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 1998 to 06 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 1999 to 06 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2000 to 06 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2001 to 06 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2005