Cypel, Tatiana Karine Simon (CPSO#: 86911)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013