Cyr, Gabrielle Marie Louise (CPSO#: 91687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Services
2 Field Ambulance Medical Clinic
258 Somme road building N-111
Garrison Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: 613-687-5511 Ext. 5392
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health, 1001 Queen Street West, Toronto, ON M6J 1H4
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELLE MARIE LOUISE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018